Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-8337
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-8337
Title:Jermaine Ruffin, Petitioner
v.
Louisiana
Docketed:April 22, 2020
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of Louisiana, First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018 KA 1280)
   Decision Date:February 28, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:September 6, 2019

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 16 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 22, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
May 14 2020Waiver of right of respondent State of Louisiana to respond filed.
Main Document
May 20 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020.
May 27 2020Response Requested. (Due June 26, 2020)
Jun 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 26, 2020 to August 25, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 03 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 25, 2020.
Aug 25 2020Brief of respondent Louisiana in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 03 2020Reply of petitioner Jermaine Ruffin filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 10 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 05 2020Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Ramos v. Louisiana, 590 U. S. ___ (2020).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
G. Ben Cohen
    Counsel of Record
The Promise of Justice Initiative
1024 Elysian Fields
New Orleans, LA 70117

bcohen@defendla.org
504-529-5955
Party name: Jermaine Ruffin
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 94005
Baton Rouge, LA 70804-9005

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: Louisiana

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543