Docket for 19-8197 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jan 20 2020 | Application (19A824) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 29, 2020 to March 29, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions | Jan 24 2020 | Application (19A824) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 30, 2020. | | | Mar 30 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 7, 2020) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixProof of Service | Apr 23 2020 | Motion of Kentucky for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (April 24, 2020 - Updated request submitted) | | | Apr 23 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 7, 2020 to July 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 24 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 6, 2020. | | | Jul 02 2020 | Brief of respondent Kentucky in opposition filed. | | Main Document | Jul 16 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020. | | | Oct 05 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|