Docket for 19-8175 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jan 24 2020 | Application (19A849) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 5, 2020 to April 3, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Main Document | Jan 28 2020 | Application (19A849) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until April 3, 2020. | | | Mar 31 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 4, 2020) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service | Apr 29 2020 | Brief of respondent The State of Nevada in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | May 04 2020 | Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from Wednesday, May 13, 2020 to Saturday, June 13, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 05 2020 | Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari granted in part; the petition will be distributed on Wednesday, June 10, 2020. | | | Jun 04 2020 | Reply of petitioner Kitrich A. Powell filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jun 10 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020. | | | Jun 29 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|