Docket for 19-8045 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jan 10 2020 | Application (19A791) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 23, 2020 to March 23, 2020, submitted to Justice Gorsuch. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Jan 14 2020 | Application (19A791) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until March 23, 2020. | | | Mar 16 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 20, 2020) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service | Apr 20 2020 | Brief of respondent State of Nebraska in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count | Apr 22 2020 | Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from May 6, 2020 to June 10, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 06 2020 | Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until June 10, 2020, granted. | | | Jun 10 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020. | | | Jun 29 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|