Docket for 19-7743 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Nov 01 2019 | Application (19A489) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 22, 2019 to February 20, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Main Document | Nov 05 2019 | Application (19A489) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 20, 2020. | | | Feb 19 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 25, 2020) | | PetitionPetitionPetitionProof of Service | Mar 10 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 25, 2020 to April 24, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 12 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 24, 2020. | | | Apr 24 2020 | Brief of respondent Oregon in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 27 2020 | Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from May 13, 2020 to June 3, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 28 2020 | Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari until June 3, 2020, granted. | | | Jun 01 2020 | Reply of petitioner Robert Langley filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jun 03 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/18/2020. | | | Jun 22 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|