SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-7647 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-7647 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
William P. Castillo, Petitioner
v.
Nevada
Docketed:
February 12, 2020
Linked with 19A595
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Nevada
Case Numbers:
(73465)
Decision Date:
May 30, 2019
Rule 12.4
Rehearing Denied:
September 6, 2019
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Nov 22 2019
Application (19A595) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 5, 2019 to February 3, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Nov 27 2019
Application (19A595) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 3, 2020.
Feb 03 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 13, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Mar 12 2020
Brief of respondent The State of Nevada in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Mar 13 2020
Brief amicus curiae of The Promise of Justice Initiative filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Mar 19 2020
Reply of petitioners William Castillo, et al. filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Apr 01 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2020.
Apr 20 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Severen Anthony
Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
411 E. Bonneville Av. Suite 250
Las Vegas, NV 89101
david_anthony@fd.org
7023886577
Party name: William Castillo, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jonathan Eugene VanBoskerck
Counsel of Record
Office of the District Attorney, Clark County, Nevada
200 Lewis Ave.
Las Vegas, NV 89155-2212
Jonathan.VanBoskerck@clarkcountyda.com
(702) 671-2794
Party name: The State of Nevada
Other
G. Ben Cohen
Counsel of Record
The Promise of Justice Initiative
1024 Elysian Fields
New Orleans, LA 70117
bcohen@defendla.org
504-529-5955
Party name: The Promise of Justice Initiative
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##