Docket for 19-7645 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Nov 26 2019 | Application (19A607) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 16, 2019 to February 14, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Dec 02 2019 | Application (19A607) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 14, 2020. | | | Feb 14 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 20, 2020) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Mar 20 2020 | Brief of respondent Lorie Davis in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 30 2020 | Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from April 9, 2020 to April 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 31 2020 | Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until April 23, 2020, granted. | | | Apr 21 2020 | Reply of petitioner Ramiro F. Gonzales filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 23 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020. | | | May 18 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|