SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-7476 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-7476 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Timothy Wayne Kemp, Petitioner
v.
Dexter Payne, Director, Arkansas Division of Correction
Docketed:
January 29, 2020
Linked with 19A501
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(15-3849)
Decision Date:
May 16, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
August 28, 2019
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Nov 04 2019
Application (19A501) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 26, 2019 to January 25, 2020, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Nov 06 2019
Application (19A501) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until January 27, 2020.
Jan 27 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 28, 2020)
Petition
Appendix
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Proof of Service
Feb 03 2020
Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 28, 2020 to April 13, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 03 2020
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 13, 2020.
Feb 27 2020
Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Apr 13 2020
Brief of respondent Dexter Payne in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Apr 24 2020
Reply of petitioner Timothy Kemp filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Apr 29 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
May 18 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Julie Pitt Vandiver
Counsel of Record
Arkansas Federal Defender Office
1401 W. Capitol Ave
Ste. 490
Little Rock, AR 72201
julie_vandiver@fd.org
5013246114
Party name: Timothy Kemp
Attorneys for Respondent
Vincent Moore Wagner
Counsel of Record
Office of the Arkansas Attorney General
323 Center Street, Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72201
vincent.wagner@arkansasag.gov
501-682-8090
Party name: Dexter Payne
Other
Judy Perry Martinez
Counsel of Record
Simon Peragine et al.
1100 Poydras Street
30th Floor, Energy Centre
New Orleans, LA 70163-3000
AmicusBriefs@americanbar.org
312-988-5000
Party name: American Bar Association
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##