Docket for 19-7097 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Oct 07 2019 | Application (19A400) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 22, 2019 to December 21, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Proof of ServiceMain DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions | Oct 09 2019 | Application (19A400) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 21, 2019. | | | Dec 18 2019 | Petition for Writ of Certiorari of Juan Sanchez not accepted for filing. (December 27, 2019) | | | Dec 18 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 29, 2020) | | PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service | Jan 27 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 29, 2020 to February 28, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jan 27 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 28, 2020. | | | Feb 27 2020 | Brief of respondent State of California in opposition filed. | | Main Document | Mar 12 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/27/2020. | | | Mar 30 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|