Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-7
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-7
Title:Seila Law LLC, Petitioner
v.
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Docketed:June 28, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-56324)
   Decision Date:May 6, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 28 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 29, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 12 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Seila Law LLC.
Blanket Consent
Jul 24 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 29, 2019 to August 28, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 28, 2019.
Jul 29 2019Brief amici curiae of Separation of Powers Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2019Brief amici curiae of States of Texas, et al. filed. (Aug. 6, 2019)(Corrected version submitted)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 29 2019Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2019Brief amici curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2019Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2019Brief amicus curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 28, 2019 to September 18, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 16 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 18, 2019.
Sep 17 2019Brief of respondent Consumer Financial Protection Bureau filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 17 2019Waiver of the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
Sep 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019.
Oct 04 2019Motion of United States House of Representatives for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae out of time filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Reply of petitioner Seila Law LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 10 2019Motion of Alan B. Morrison for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae out of time filed.
Proof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountMain Document
Oct 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/18/2019.
Oct 18 2019Motion of United States House of Representatives for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae out of time GRANTED.
Oct 18 2019Motion of Alan B. Morrison for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae out of time GRANTED.
Oct 18 2019Petition GRANTED. In addition to the question presented by the petition, the parties are directed to brief and argue the following question: If the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau is found unconstitutional on the basis of the separation of powers, can 12 U.S.C. ยง5491(c)(3) be severed from the Dodd-Frank Act?.
Oct 22 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Seila Law LLC.
Blanket Consent
Oct 23 2019Paul D. Clement, Esquire, of Washington, D.C., is invited to brief and argue this case, as amicus curiae, in support of the judgment below on the question presented by the petition.
Oct 28 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Blanket Consent
Oct 28 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Oct 30 2019Amicus curiae briefs, on both or either question being brief in this case, shall be filed within 7 days after the party supported files its brief on the question presented by the petition.
Oct 30 2019Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix, petitioner's brief on the merits, and respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including December 9, 2019. The time to file the brief on the merits of Court-appointed amicus curiae in support of the judgment below on the question presented by the petition is extended to and including January 15, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Seila Law LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Other
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts LLP
1299 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20004

scott.keller@bakerbotts.com
2026397700
Party name: Cato Institute
Alan B. Morrison
    Counsel of Record
George Washington Law School
2000 H Street NW
Washington, DC 20052

abmorrison@law.gwu.edu
2029947120
Party name: Alan B. Morrison
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3000
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Oliver James Dunford
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

odunford@pacificlegal.org
9164197111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: STATES OF TEXAS, ARKANSAS, GEORGIA, INDIANA, KANSAS, LOUISIANA, NEBRASKA, OKLAHOMA, SOUTH CAROLINA, TENNESSEE, UTAH, AND WEST VIGINIA
Kimberly Stewart Hermann
    Counsel of Record
Southeastern Legal Foundation
560 W. Crossville Rd.
Suite 104
Roswell, GA 30075-7509

khermann@southeasternlegal.org
770-977-2131
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation and National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center
Richard Peter Hutchison
    Counsel of Record
Landmark Legal Foundation
3100 Broadway
Suite 1200
Kansas City, MO 64111

pete.hutch@landmarklegal.org
8169315559
Party name: Landmark Legal Foundation
Douglas Neal Letter
    Counsel of Record
Office of General Counsel, United States House of Representatives
219 Cannon House Office Building
Washington, DC 20515

douglas.letter@mail.house.gov
202-225-9700
Party name: United States House of Representatives
Ilan Wurman
    Counsel of Record
Sandra Day O'Connor College of Law, Arizona State University
111 E. Taylor St , MC 9520
Phoenix, AZ 85004

ilan.wurman@gmail.com
480-965-2245
Party name: Separation of Powers Scholars

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543