Docket for 19-6878 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Dec 04 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 6, 2020) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendix | Dec 31 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 6, 2020 to February 5, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jan 02 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 5, 2020. | | | Feb 05 2020 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Feb 19 2020 | Reply of petitioner Robert Bolden filed. (Distributed) | | Main Document | Feb 20 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/6/2020. | | | Mar 09 2020 | Petition DENIED. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. | | |
|