Docket for 19-6804
|
Nov 23 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 2, 2020) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Jan 16 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020. | | | Feb 24 2020 | The motion of petitioner for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. Petitioner is allowed until March 16, 2020, within which to pay the docketing fee required by Rule 38(a) and to submit a petition in compliance with Rule 33.1 of the Rules of this Court. | | | Mar 16 2020 | Petitioner complied with order of February 24, 2020. | | | Jul 02 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020. | | | Oct 05 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|