Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-677
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-677
Title:Dave Yost, et al., Petitioners
v.
Planned Parenthood Southwest Ohio Region, et al.
Docketed:November 26, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3866, 17-3867)
   Decision Date:July 25, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:August 29, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 22 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 26, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 26, 2019 to January 27, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 27, 2020.
Dec 26 2019Brief amici curiae of Georgia, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 27, 2020 to February 26, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 03 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 26, 2020.
Feb 26 2020Brief of respondents Planned Parenthood Southwest Ohio Region, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2020Reply of petitioners Dave Yost, Ohio Attorney General, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 11 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/27/2020.
Jun 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2020.
Jun 29 2020Supplemental brief of petitioners Dave Yost, Ohio Attorney General, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 02 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: Dave Yost, Ohio Attorney General, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jennifer Lynn Branch
    Counsel of Record
Gerhardstein & Branch Co LPA
441 Vine Street
3400
Cincinnati, OH 45202

jbranch@gbfirm.com
513-621-9100
Party name: Planned Parenthood Southwest Ohio Region, et al.
Other
Andrew Alan Pinson
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Georgia Attorney General
40 Capital Square SW
Atlanta, GA 30334-1300

apinson@law.ga.gov
404-651-9453
Party name: Georgia, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543