Docket for 19-6426 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Sep 13 2019 | Application (19A313) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 24, 2019 to October 24, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main DocumentMain Document | Sep 17 2019 | Application (19A313) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until October 24, 2019. | | | Oct 24 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 29, 2019) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisAppendixPetition | Nov 21 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 29, 2019 to December 29, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 25 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 30, 2019. | | | Dec 20 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 30, 2019 to January 29, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 27 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 29, 2020. | | | Jan 28 2020 | Brief of respondent Lorie Davis in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Feb 13 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020. | | | Mar 02 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | | Mar 27 2020 | Petition of John Ramirez for rehearing not accepted for filing. (April 01, 2020) | | | Mar 27 2020 | Petition for Rehearing filed. | | Main Document | Apr 28 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020. | | | May 18 2020 | Rehearing DENIED. | | |
|