Sep 04 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 27, 2019) |
| Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Nov 27 2019 | Waiver of right of respondent Howard Prince to respond filed. |
| Main Document |
Dec 05 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020. |
| |
Dec 10 2019 | Response Requested. (Due January 9, 2020) |
| |
Dec 30 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 9, 2020 to March 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Dec 31 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 9, 2020. |
| |
Mar 09 2020 | Brief of respondent Howard Prince in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Mar 23 2020 | Reply of petitioner Ricky Langley filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Mar 26 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2020. |
| |
Apr 20 2020 | Petition DENIED. |
| |