Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-635
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-635
Title:Donald J. Trump, Petitioner
v.
Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., in His Official Capacity as District Attorney of the County of New York, et al.
Docketed:November 18, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-3204)
   Decision Date:November 4, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 14 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 18, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 21 2019Brief of respondents Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., in his official capacity as district attorney of the County of New York,et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 21 2019Waiver of right of respondent Mazars USA LLP to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 22 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Nov 25 2019Reply of petitioner Donald Trump filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Christian Family Coalition (CFC) Florida, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/13/2019.
Dec 13 2019Petition GRANTED. The case will set for argument in the March 2020 argument session.
Jan 08 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Donald Trump
Blanket Consent
Jan 15 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Mazars USA LLP.
Blanket Consent
Jan 15 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., in his official capacity as District Attorney of the County of New York.
Blanket Consent
Jan 21 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Donald Trump.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 27 2020Brief of petitioner Donald J. Trump filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, March 31, 2020.
Feb 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Feb 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed. (Also in 19-715 & 19-760) VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of Christian Family Coalition (CFC) Florida, Inc. filed. (Also in 19-715 & 19-760) VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2020Letter of respondent Mazars USA LLP notifying the Clerk that it does not intend to participate in this case filed. (Also in 19-715 & 19-760). VIDED
Main Document
Feb 19 2020CIRCULATED
Feb 19 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit.
Feb 19 2020The record received from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit has been electronically filed.
Feb 20 2020Sealed documents sent from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit are electronically filed.
Feb 24 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Feb 26 2020Brief of respondent Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., in his Official Capacity as District Attorney of the County of New York filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2020Sealed document sent by the U.S.D.C Southern District of New York. (1-Envelope)
Mar 02 2020Brief amici curiae of Former Republican Members of Congress, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2020Brief amici curiae of Boston University Law Professors Sean J. Kealy and James J. Wheaton filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2020Brief amici curiae of Washington State Tax Practitioners filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2020Brief amici curiae of Former Department of Justice Officials filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2020Brief amici curiae of Electronic Privacy Information Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2020Brief amici curiae of The American Civil Liberties Union, and The New York Civil Liberties Union filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2020Brief amici curiae of Commonwealth of Virginia, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2020Brief amici curiae of Claire Finkelstein and the Center for Ethics and the Rule of Law at the University of Pennsylvania filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2020Brief amicus curiae of David Boyle filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2020Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 04 2020Brief amicus curiae of Eugene H. Goldberg filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 16 2020ORAL ARGUMENT POSTPONED.
Mar 23 2020Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Mar 27 2020Reply of petitioner Donald J. Trump filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Litigation and Advocacy Group, P.C.
1701 Pennsylvania Ave, NW, Ste. 200
Washington, DC 20006

jsekulow@claglaw.com
2025468890
Party name: Donald Trump
Attorneys for Respondents
Jerry D. Bernstein
    Counsel of Record
Blank Rome LLP
1271 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020

jbernstein@blankrome.com
212-885-5511
Party name: Mazars USA LLP
Carey R. Dunne
    Counsel of Record
New York County District Attorney's Office
One Hogan Place
New York, NY 10013

dunnec@dany.nyc.gov
2123359000
Party name: CYRUS R. VANCE, JR., in his official capacity as district attorney of the County of New York
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Richard William Painter
    Counsel of Record
University of Minnesota Law School
229 19th Avenue S.
Minneapolis MN, MN 55455

rpainter@umn.edu
612-626-9707
Party name: Claire Finkelstein and the Center for Ethics and the Rule of Law at the University of Pennsylvania
David Christopher Boyle
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 15143
Long Beach, CA 90815

dbo@boyleslaw.org
(734)-904-6132
Party name: David Boyle
David D. Cole
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
915 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

dcole@aclu.org
(202) 675-2330
Party name: The American Civil Liberties Union, and The New York Civil Liberties Union
Justin Grant Florence
    Counsel of Record
Protect Democracy Project
15 Main Street
Suite 312
Watertown, MA 02472

justin.florence@protectdemocracy.org
(202) 579-4582
Party name: Former Republican Members of Congress, et al.
Dirk Giseburt
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
920 Fifth Avenue
Suite 3300
Seattle, WA 98101

dirkgiseburt@dwt.com
206-757-8049
Party name: Washington State Tax Practitioners
Eugene H. Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
686 Harrison Avenue
East Meadow, NY 11554

eman352@optonline.net
5166952035
Party name: Eugene H. Goldberg
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Former Department of Justice Officials
Dennis Grossman
    Counsel of Record
6701 Sunset Drive
Suite 104
Miami, FL 33143

dagrossmanlaw@aol.com
5164666690
Party name: Christian Family Coalition (CFC) Florida, Inc.
Toby Jay Heytens
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219

SolicitorGeneral@oag.state.va.us
(804) 786-7240
Party name: Commonwealth of Virginia, et al.
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund
Marc Rotenberg
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Privacy Information Center
1519 New Hampshire Ave NW
Washington, DC 20036

rotenberg@epic.org
2024831140
Party name: Electronic Privacy Information Center
James John Wheaton
    Counsel of Record
Boston University School of Law
765 Commonwealth Avenue
Boston, MA 02215

jwheaton@bu.edu
(617) 353-3100
Party name: Boston University Law Professors Sean J. Kealy and James J. Wheaton

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543