Docket for 19-592
|
Nov 04 2019 | Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, County Commissioners of Carroll County, Maryland. | | Blanket Consent | Nov 04 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 6, 2019) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 12 2019 | Waiver of right of respondent Maryland Department of the Environment to respond filed. | | Main Document | Nov 20 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/6/2019. | | | Nov 25 2019 | Brief amici curiae of The National Association of Clean Water Agencies, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 26 2019 | Response Requested. (Due December 26, 2019) | | | Dec 04 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 26, 2019 to January 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 06 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 23, 2020. | | | Jan 23 2020 | Brief of respondent Maryland Department of the Environment in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 12 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020. | | | Mar 02 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|