Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-5744
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-5744
Title:Johnny Ellery Smith, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 30, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-30248)
   Decision Date:May 28, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 26 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 30, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetition
Sep 13 2019Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019.
Oct 15 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stephen Reese Sady
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
101 SW Main Street
Suite 1700
Portland, OR 97204

steve_sady@fd.org
503-326-2123
Party name: Johnny Smith
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543