May 30 2019 | Application (19A156) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 6, 2019 to August 5, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito. |
| Main Document |
Aug 05 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 11, 2019) |
| Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionCertificate of Word CountAppendixProof of Service |
Aug 09 2019 | Application (19A156) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until August 5, 2019. |
| |
Sep 04 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 11, 2019 to October 11, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Sep 05 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 11, 2019. |
| |
Sep 23 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 11, 2019 to November 11, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Sep 23 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 12, 2019. |
| |
Nov 07 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 12, 2019 to November 26, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Nov 08 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 26, 2019. |
| |
Nov 20 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 26, 2019 to January 17, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Nov 21 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 17, 2020. |
| |
Jan 17 2020 | Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Feb 06 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020. |
| |
Feb 06 2020 | Reply of petitioner Julius Omar Robinson filed. (Distributed). |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Feb 24 2020 | Petition DENIED. |
| |