Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-55
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-55
Title:James W. Richards, IV, Petitioner
v.
Matthew P. Donovan, Acting Secretary of the Air Force, et al.
Docketed:July 10, 2019
Linked with 18A1205
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(19-0093/AF)
   Decision Date:January 31, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:March 1, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 20 2019Application (18A1205) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 30, 2019 to July 9, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 22 2019Application (18A1205) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 9, 2019.
Jul 08 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 9, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Jul 17 2019Waiver of right of respondent Donovan, Matthew, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 31 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Aug 14 2019Response Requested. (Due September 13, 2019)
Sep 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 13, 2019 to October 15, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 15, 2019.
Oct 09 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 15, 2019 to November 21, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 21, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark Clifford Bruegger
    Counsel of Record
U.S. Air Force
1500 W. Perimeter Rd, Suite 1100
Joint Base Andrews, MD 20762

mark.c.bruegger.civ@mail.mil
2406124770
Party name: James Richards
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Donovan, Matthew, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543