Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-547
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-547
Title:United States Fish and Wildlife Service, et al., Petitioners
v.
Sierra Club, Inc.
Docketed:October 28, 2019
Linked with 19A185
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-16560)
   Decision Date:May 30, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 16 2019Application (19A185) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 28, 2019 to September 27, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 19 2019Application (19A185) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until September 27, 2019.
Sep 17 2019Application (19A185) to extend further the time from September 27, 2019 to October 25, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Written RequestProof of Service
Sep 17 2019Application (19A185) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until October 25, 2019.
Oct 25 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 27, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word Count
Nov 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 27, 2019 to January 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 6, 2020.
Jan 06 2020Brief of respondent Sierra Club, Inc. in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Jan 22 2020Reply of petitioners United States Fish and Wildlife Service,, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020.
Mar 02 2020Petition GRANTED.
Mar 13 2020Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Mar 16 2020Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including May 18, 2020. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 20, 2020.
Apr 09 2020Motion for a further extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Apr 21 2020Motion to further extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is further extended to and including May 21, 2020. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is further extended to and including July 27, 2020.
May 21 2020Brief of petitioners United States Fish and Wildlife Service, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
May 21 2020Joint appendix filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jun 02 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Sierra Club, Inc.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Jul 27 2020Brief of respondent Sierra Club, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 31 2020Brief amici curiae of Center for Biological Diversity and Defenders of Wildlife filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of Electronic Privacy Information Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 03 2020Brief amici curiae of American Forest Resource Council, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 03 2020Brief amici curiae of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 28 Media Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 03 2020Brief amici curiae of ACLU, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 03 2020Brief amici curiae of Andrew Rosenberg, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, November 2, 2020.
Aug 26 2020Reply of petitioners United States Fish and Wildlife Service, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 31 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Sep 02 2020CIRCULATED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Fish and Wildlife Service, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Sanjay Narayan
    Counsel of Record
Sierra Club Environmental Law Program
2101 Webster Street
Suite 1300
Oakland, CA 94612

sanjay.narayan@sierraclub.org
4159775769
Party name: Sierra Club, Inc.
Other
Bruce David Brown
    Counsel of Record
Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press
1156 15th St., NW, Ste. 1020
Washington, DC 20005

bbrown@rcfp.org
2027959300
Party name: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 28 Media Organizations
Alan Jay Butler
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Privacy Information Center
1519 New Hampshire Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20036

butler@epic.org
2024831140
Party name: Electronic Privacy Information Center
David D. Cole
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
915 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

dcole@aclu.org
212-549-2611
Party name: ACLU et al
Lawson Emmett Fite
    Counsel of Record
American Forest Resource Council
700 N.E. Multnomah, Ste. 320
Portland, OR 97232

lfite@amforest.org
5032229505
Party name: American Forest Resource Council et al
Eric R. Glitzenstein
    Counsel of Record
Center for Biological Diversity
1411 K Street, N.W.
Suite 1300
Washington, DC 20005

eglitzenstein@biologicaldiversity.org
2022625965
Party name: Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife
Shaun Alaric Goho
    Counsel of Record
Emmett Environmental Law & Policy Clinic Harvard Law School
6 Everett St.
Suite 5116
Cambridge, MA 02138

sgoho@law.harvard.edu
617-496-2058
Party name: Andrew Rosenberg, Jacob Carter and Joel Clement

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543