Docket for 19-5201
|
Jan 02 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 15, 2019) | | PetitionAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendix | Jul 24 2019 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. | | Main Document | Aug 01 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. | | | Oct 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|