SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-5122 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-5122 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
David Alan Westerfield, Petitioner
v.
California
Docketed:
July 9, 2019
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of California
Case Numbers:
(S112691)
Decision Date:
February 4, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
April 10, 2019
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jul 03 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 8, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Proof of Service
Aug 07 2019
Brief of respondent The State of California in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Aug 22 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark D. Greenberg
Counsel of Record
484 LAKE PARK AVENUE, NO. 429
OAKLAND, CA 94610
markdgreen2@comcast.net
510-452-3126
Party name: DAVID WESTERFIELD
Attorneys for Respondent
Robin Helene Urbanski
Counsel of Record
The California Attorney General
600 West Broadway
Suite 1800
San Diego, CA 92101
robin.urbanski@doj.ca.gov
6197389115
Party name: The State of California
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##