Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-351
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-351
Title:Federal Republic of Germany, et al., Petitioners
v.
Alan Philipp, et al.
Docketed:September 18, 2019
Linked with 19A118
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-7064, 17-7117)
   Decision Date:July 10, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:June 18, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 26 2019Application (19A118) for a stay pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Jul 30 2019Application (19A118) denied by The Chief Justice. The application is denied without prejudice to petitioners filing a new application after seeking relief in the district court.
Sep 16 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 18, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 17 2019Brief of respondents Alan Philipp, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2019Reply of petitioners Federal Republic of Germany, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Jan 21 2020The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 26 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 08 2020Supplemental brief of respondents Alan Philipp, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020.
Jun 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2020.
Jul 02 2020Petition GRANTED.
Jul 29 2020Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 4, 2020. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including October 22, 2020.
Jul 31 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Alan Philipp, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jul 31 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Federal Republic of Germany, et al.
Blanket Consent
Sep 04 2020Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main Document
Sep 04 2020Brief of petitioners Federal Republic of Germany, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2020Proposal of petitioners to lodge materials under Rule 32.3 filed.
Main Document
Sep 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Davis R. Robinson, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Foreign International Law Scholars and Jurists filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Sep 11 2020Brief amici curiae of Professors Samuel Estreicher and Thomas H. Lee in support of neither party filed (also in 18-1447). VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 11 2020Brief amicus curiae of Societe Nationale SNCF SA in support of neither party filed (also in 18-1447). VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2020Brief amici curiae of Holocaust and Nuremberg Historians in support of neither part filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 16 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, December 7, 2020.
Oct 08 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. District of Columbia Circuit.
Oct 19 2020Brief amici curiae of National Jewish Commission on Law and Public Affairs (COLPA), et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 19 2020Record received from the U.S.C.A. D.C. Circuit is electronic and located on PACER.
Oct 22 2020Brief of respondents Alan Philipp, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 22 2020Proposal of Respondents to lodge materials under Rule 32.3 filed.
Main Document
Oct 27 2020CIRCULATED
Oct 27 2020Brief amici curiae of Florida Holocaust Museum, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Oct 28 2020Brief amici curiae of The 1939 Society, et al. filed (also in 18-1447) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Holocaust Art Restitution Project, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2020Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 29 2020Brief amici curiae of Members of the United States House of Representatives filed (also in 18-1447). VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2020Brief amici curiae of Professor William S. Dodge and Professor Maggie Gardner filed (also in 18-1447). VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2020Brief amici curiae of The World Jewish Congress, Commission for Art Recovery, and Ambassador Ronald S. Lauder filed (also in 18-1447). VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2020Brief amici curiae of American Association of Jewish Lawyers and Jurists and other advocates for Holocaust restitution filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2020Brief amici curiae of Holocaust Survivors Foundation, USA, Inc., et al. (also in 19-351) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of Peter Toren filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2020Proposal of amici curiae the World Jewish Congress, Commission for Art Recovery, and Ambassador Ronald S. Lauder to lodge materials under Rule 32.3 filed.
Main Document
Nov 09 2020Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Nov 23 2020Reply of petitioners Federal Republic of Germany, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2020Argued. For petitioners: Jonathan M. Freiman, New Haven, Conn.; and Edwin S. Kneedler, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondents: Nicholas M. O'Donnell, Boston, Mass.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jonathan M. Freiman
    Counsel of Record
Wiggin & Dana LLP
One Century Tower
P.O. Box 1832
New Haven, CT 06508-1832

jfreiman@wiggin.com
203-498-4584
Party name: Federal Republic of Germany, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Nicholas Michael O'Donnell
    Counsel of Record
Sullivan & Worcester LLP
One Post Office Square
Boston, MA 02109

nodonnell@sullivanlaw.com
617-338-2814
Party name: Alan Philipp, et al.
Other
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
John Bellinger Bellinger III
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

john.bellinger@arnoldporter.com
202-942-6599
Party name: Societe Nationale SNCF SA
Donald S Burris
    Counsel of Record
Burris & Schoenberg, LLP
12121 Wilshire Blvd.
Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90025

don@bslaw.net
310-442-5559
Party name: Florida Holocaust Museum, et al.
Pierre Ciric
    Counsel of Record
The Ciric Law Firm, PLLC
335 East 14th Street
Suite # 1171
New York, NY 10009

pciric@ciriclawfirm.com
(212) 260-6090
Party name: The Holocaust Art Restitution Project, Inc.
Samuel J. Dubbin
    Counsel of Record
Dubbin & Kravetz, LLP
1200 Anastasia Ave., #300
Coral Gables, FL 33134

sdubbin@dubbinkravetz.com
305 815-8060
Party name: Holocaust Survivors Foundation, USA, Inc., Renee Firestone, David Mermelstein, David Schaecter, Klaire Firestone, Thomas Weiss, M.D., And Naomi Vilko, M.D.
Lisa Marie Geary
    Counsel of Record
RMP, LLP
5519 Hackett Rd.
Springdale, AR 72762

lgeary@rmp.law
4794432705
Party name: Foreign International Law Scholars and Jurists
James Harold Hulme
    Counsel of Record
Arent Fox LLP
1717 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006-5342

james.hulme@arentfox.com
2028576144
Party name: Davis R. Robinson, Abraham D. Sofaer, David P. Stewart and Edwin Williamson
Thomas Russell Kline
    Counsel of Record
Cultural Heritage Partners, PLLC
2101 L Street, NW Suite 800
Washington, DC 20037

tom@culturalheritagepartners.com
(202) 567-7594
Party name: The World Jewish Congress, Commission for Art Recovery, and Ambassador Ronald S. Lauder
Geoffrey Morris Klineberg
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

gklineberg@kellogghansen.com
2023267928
Party name: Professor William S. Dodge and Professor Maggie Gardner
Nathan Lewin
    Counsel of Record
Lewin & Lewin, LLP
888 17th St. NW, 4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

nat@lewinlewin.com
2028281000
Party name: National Jewish Commission on Law and Public Affairs (COLPA), et al.
Owen C. Pell
    Counsel of Record
White & Case LLP
1221 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020-1095

opell@whitecase.com
212-819-8891
Party name: Holocaust and Nuremberg Historians
Lawrence Saul Robbins
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP
2000 K Street NW
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

lrobbins@robbinsrussell.com
(202) 775-4501
Party name: Peter Toren
Amelia Lynn Borrego Sargent
    Counsel of Record
Willenken LLP
707 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 3850
Los Angeles, CA 90017

asargent@willenken.com
2139559240
Party name: Professors Samuel Estreicher And Thomas H. Lee
Akiva Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166

ashapiro@gibsondunn.com
(212) 351-4000
Party name: Members of the United States House of Representatives
Benjamin Gross Shatz
    Counsel of Record
Manatt, Phelps, & Phillips, LLP
2049 Century Park East
Suite 1700
Los Angeles, CA 90067-3119

bshatz@manatt.com
3103124383
Party name: The 1939 Society, Michael Bazyler, Bet Tzedek, Center for the Study of Law & Genocide at LMU Loyola Law School, and The Holocaust Education Center in the Desert, Inc. d/b/a Tolerance Education Center
Arthur Richter Traldi
    Counsel of Record
Andreozzi & Foote
4503 N. Front Street
Harrisburg, PA 18042

traldilaw2018@gmail.com
6104287179
Party name: American Association of Jewish Lawyers and Jurists and other advocates for Holocaust restitution

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543