Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-294
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-294
Title:Usama Jamil Hamama, et al., Petitioners
v.
Rebecca Adducci, et al.
Docketed:September 4, 2019
Linked with 18A1337
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2171, 18-1233)
   Decision Date:December 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:April 2, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 17 2019Application (18A1337) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 1, 2019 to August 30, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 25 2019Application (18A1337) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until August 30, 2019.
Aug 30 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 4, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 4, 2019 to November 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 4, 2019.
Oct 23 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 4, 2019 to December 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 24 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 4, 2019.
Dec 04 2019Brief of respondents Adducci, Adducci, et al. in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 17 2019Reply of petitioners Usama Jamil Hamama, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jun 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2020.
Jul 02 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Margo Schlanger
    Counsel of Record
625 So. State Street
LR 910
Ann Arbor, MI 48109

margo.schlanger@gmail.com
12022772506
Party name: Usama Jamil Hamama, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Adducci, Adducci, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543