Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1418
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1418
Title:Zoie H., Petitioner
v.
Nebraska
Docketed:June 25, 2020
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Nebraska
   Case Numbers:(S-18-1028)
   Decision Date:January 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 22 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 27, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 17 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 27, 2020 to August 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 6, 2020.
Jul 24 2020Brief amici curiae of Professors of Second Amendment Law, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 06 2020Brief of respondent Nebraska in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 389-5000
Party name: Zoie H.
Attorneys for Respondent
James A. Campbell
    Counsel of Record
Nebraska Attorney General's Office
2115 State Capitol
Lincoln, NE 68509

jim.campbell@nebraska.gov
402-471-2682
Party name: Nebraska
Other
Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
    Counsel of Record
Firearms Policy Coalition
1215 K Street, 17th Floor
Sacramento, CA 95814

josephgreenlee@gmail.com
(916) 378-5785
Party name: Professors of Second Amendment Law, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543