SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-1416
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-1416
Title:
Mateusz Fijalkowski, Petitioner
v.
M. Wheeler, et al.
Docketed:
June 25, 2020
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(19-1262)
Decision Date:
March 9, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jun 19 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 27, 2020)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jul 24 2020
Brief of respondents M Wheeler, et al. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jul 27 2020
Reply of petitioner Mateusz Fijalkowski filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Aug 05 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 05 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Victor Michael Glasberg
Counsel of Record
Victor M. Glasberg & Associates
121 South Columbus Street
Alexandria, VA 22314
vmg@robinhoodesq.com
7036841100
Party name: Mateusz Fijalkowski
Attorneys for Respondents
Benjamin R. Jacewicz
Counsel of Record
Office of the County Attorney, Fairfax County, Vir
12000 Government Center Parkway
Suite 549
Fairfax, VA 22035
benjamin.jacewicz@fairfaxcounty.gov
7033242421
Party name: M Wheeler, et al.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##