Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1392
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1392
Title:Thomas E. Dobbs, State Health Officer of the Mississippi Department of Health, et al., Petitioners
v.
Jackson Women's Health Organization, et al.
Docketed:June 18, 2020
Linked with 19A1027
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-60868)
   Decision Date:December 13, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:January 17, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 16 2020Application (19A1027) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 16, 2020 to June 15, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 19 2020Application (19A1027) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until June 15, 2020.
Jun 15 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 20, 2020)
PetitionAppendixAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 25 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 20, 2020 to August 19, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 26 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 19, 2020, for all respondents.
Jul 14 2020Brief amici curiae of Roman Catholic Diocese of Jackson and Roman Catholic Diocese of Biloxi filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 14 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Thomas Dobbs, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jul 17 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law & Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2020Brief amici curiae of 375 Women Injured By Second and Third Trimester Late Term Abortions and Melinda Thybault, Individually and Acting on Behalf of 336,214 Signers of The Moral Outcry Petition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountOther
Jul 20 2020Brief amici curiae of The States of Texas, Alabama, Alaska, Arizona, Arkansas, Georgia, Idaho, Indiana, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Missouri, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, Tennessee and West Virginia filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 20 2020Brief amicus curiae of Illinois Right to Life filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 20 2020Brief amici curiae of American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Inner Life Fund and Institute for Faith and Family filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2020Amicus brief of Robin Pierucci, M.D., and Life Legal Defense Foundation submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2020Brief of respondents Jackson Women's Health Organization, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Sep 02 2020Reply of petitioners Thomas Dobbs, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 22 2020Rescheduled.
Oct 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Oct 05 2020Rescheduled.
Oct 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/16/2020.
Oct 14 2020Rescheduled.
Oct 22 2020Supplemental brief of petitioners Thomas Dobbs, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/30/2020.
Oct 26 2020Supplemental brief of respondents Jackson Women's Health Organization, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2020Supplemental brief of respondents Jackson Women's Health Organization, et al. filed (33.1 format).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2020Rescheduled.
Nov 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/6/2020.
Nov 04 2020Rescheduled.
Nov 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/13/2020.
Nov 10 2020Rescheduled.
Nov 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/20/2020.
Nov 18 2020Rescheduled.
Nov 30 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Dec 01 2020Rescheduled.
Dec 07 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/11/2020.
Dec 09 2020Rescheduled.
Jan 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/15/2021.
Jan 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021.
Feb 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/26/2021.
Mar 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021.
Mar 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
Mar 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021.
Mar 29 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2021.
Apr 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.
Apr 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/23/2021.
Apr 26 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/30/2021.
May 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/13/2021.
May 17 2021Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
May 26 2021Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jun 01 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Jackson Women's Health Organization, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jun 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including July 22, 2021. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 13, 2021.
Jun 09 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Thomas Dobbs, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jul 19 2021Brief amicus curiae of Cleveland Lawyers for Life filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of David Boyle filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2021Brief amicus curiae of Jewish Prolife Foundation, The Coalition for Jewish Values, Rabbi Yacov David Cohen, Rabbi Chananya Weissman, and Bonnie Chernin (President, Jewish Life League) filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2021Brief of petitioners Thomas Dobbs, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2021Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main Document
Jul 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of Alabama Center for Law and Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2021Brief amici curiae of 375 Women Injured By Second And Third Trimester Late Term Abortions and Abortion Recovery Leaders filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 23 2021Brief amici curiae of National Right to Life Committee and Louisiana Right to Life Federation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2021Brief amicus curiae of Jewish Coalition For Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2021Brief amici curiae of Catholic Medical Association, National Association of Catholic Nurses-USA, Idaho Chooses Life and Texas Alliance for Life filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2021Brief amici curiae of African American, Hispanic, Roman Catholic and Protestant Religious and Civil Rights Organizations and Leaders filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 26 2021Brief amicus curiae of Senators Josh Hawley, Mike Lee, and Ted Cruz filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2021Brief amicus curiae of Trinity Legal Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2021Brief amicus curiae of Thomas More Society filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2021Brief amici curiae of Melinda Thybault, Founder of The Moral Outcry Petition, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2021Brief amici curiae of U.S. Conference of Catholic Bishops and Other Religious Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of LONANG Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2021Brief amici curiae of 22 State Policy Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2021Brief amici curiae of Connie Weiskopf and Kristine L. Brown filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Professor Kurt T. Lash filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2021Brief amici curiae of Robin Pierucci, M.D., and Life Legal Defense Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Priests for Life filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2021Brief amici curiae of Amicus Curiae Hannah S., John S. and Marlene S filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021Brief amici curiae of The Center for Medical Progress and David Daleiden filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021Brief amici curiae of European Legal Scholars in Support of Neither Party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021Brief amici curiae of 396 State Legislators from 41 States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021Brief amici curiae of 141 International Legal Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of Prolife Center at the University of St. Thomas filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of Mary Kay Bacallao Advocating for Unborn Children as Persons in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of Professor Randy Beck filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 28 2021Brief amici curiae of Christian Legal Society and Robertson Center for Constitutional Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of Center for Religious Expression filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of Center for Family and Human Rights filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of Concerned Women for America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021Amicus brief of Foundation for Moral Law, Lutherans for Life submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Americans United for Life filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Ethics and Public Policy Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Pennsylvania Pro-Life Federation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Family Research Council filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Human Coalition Action and Students for Life of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Lee J. Strang filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Biologists in Support of Neither Party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Professors Mary Ann Glendon and O. Carter Snead filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Monique Chireau Wubbenhorst, M.D., M.P.H., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Commissioner Andy Gipson, Former Representative and Chair of Mississippi House Judiciary B Committee filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Care Net, a National Affiliation Organization of 1,200 Pregnancy Help Centers, and Alpha Center, a South Dakota Registered Pregnancy Help Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Reason for Life filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Illinois Right to Life, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Jonathan English filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Intercessors for America including its Intercessor Prayer Partners filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of 228 Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Governor Henry McMaster and Eleven Additional Governors filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of The European Centre for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of National Catholic Bioethics Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Professor Stephen G. Gilles filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Jurisprudence John M. Finnis and Robert P. George filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of States of Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of The American Cornerstone Institute and its founder Dr. Benjamin S. Carson filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Advancing American Freedom, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Democrats for Life of America Five Democratic Legislators from Five Individual State Legislatures filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians and Gynecologists filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Women Legislators, The Susan B. Anthony List filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Christian Medical & Dental Associations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Maureen L. Condic, Ph.D. and the Charlotte Lozier Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of American College of Pediatricians and Association of American Physicians & Surgeons filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of CatholicVote.org Education Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Heartbeat International, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Rep. Steve Carra and 320 State Legislators from 35 States filed.
OtherMain DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Foundation to Abolish Abortion, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of World Faith Foundation and Institute for Faith and Family filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of March for Life Education and Defense Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Elliot Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Texas Right to Life filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice and Bioethics Defense Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Amicus brief of Billy Graham Evangelistic Association, et al. not accepted for filing. (August 03, 2021 - Correct service required; to be printed).
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Billy Graham Evangelistic Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Amicus brief of Pacific Justice Institute not accepted for filing. (August 03, 2021 - Correct service required; to be printed)
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Justice Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Amicus brief of Joseph W. Dellapenna not accepted for filing. (August 03, 2021 - Correct service required; to be printed)
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Joseph W. Dellapenna filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of 240 Women Scholars and Professionals, and Prolife Feminist Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Good Counsel, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 03 2021Amicus brief of 240 Women Scholars and Professionals, and Prolife Feminist Organizations submitted.
Sep 13 2021Brief of respondents Jackson Women's Health Organization, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 16 2021Amicus brief of Anthony Hawks submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2021Amicus brief of The Freedom From Religion Foundation, Center for Inquiry, and American Atheists submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2021Amicus brief of Experts, Researchers, and Advocates Opposing the Criminalization of People Who Have Abortions submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2021Amicus brief of Cecilia Fire Thunder; National Indigenous Women’s Resource Center; the Native American Community Board; and Additional Advocacy Organizations and Individuals submitted.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2021Amicus brief of Advocates for Youth, Inc. and Neo Philanthropy, Inc. d/b/a We Testify submitted.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Scott Grant Stewart
    Counsel of Record
Mississippi Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 220
Jackson, MS 39205-0220

scott.stewart@ago.ms.gov
(601) 359-5563
Party name: Thomas Dobbs, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Hillary Anne Schneller
    Counsel of Record
Center for Reproductive Rights
199 Water Street, 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10038

hschneller@reprorights.org
(917) 637-3777
Party name: Jackson Women's Health Organization, et al.
Other
Steven Henry Aden
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Life
1150 Connecticut Ave. NW
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20036

Steven.Aden@aul.org
2526732282
Party name: 228 Members of Congress
H. Christopher Bartolomucci
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

cbartolomucci@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Women Legislators and The Susan B. Anthony List
James Bopp Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Bopp Law Firm, PC
The National Building
1 South Sixth Street
Terre Haute, IN 47807

jboppjr@aol.com
8122322434
Party name: National Right to Life Committee and Louisiana Right to Life Federation
Kristine Lee Brown
    Counsel of Record
Attorney At Law
8700 E Jefferson Ave #371703
Denver, CO 80237

kristi@kristiburtonbrown.com
302-515-2721
Party name: Connie Weiskopf and Kristine L. Brown
Mary Jane Browning
    Counsel of Record
MaryBrowning, LLC
214 Cherry Street
Jefferson, MO 65101

mary@maryjbrowninglaw.com
5732306945
Party name: Amicus Curiae Hannah S., John S. and Marlene S
Renee Kristine Carlson
    Counsel of Record
True North Legal
2855 Anthony Lane South
Minneapolis, MN 55418

rcarlson@truenorthlegalmn.org
6127898811
Party name: Advancing American Freedom, Inc.; Minnesota Family Council; Center for Political Renewal; The Family Leader (Iowa); Family Heritage Alliance; and Nebraska Family Alliance
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Counsel Group
174 W. Lincoln Ave., #620
Anaheim, CA 92805

atcaso@ccg1776.com
916-601-1916
Party name: Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Harold J. Cassidy
    Counsel of Record
The Cassidy Law Firm
750 Broad Street
Suite 3
Shrewsbury, NJ 07702

hjc@haroldcassidy.com
7327473999
Party name: Care Net, a National Affiliation Organization of 1,200 Pregnancy Help Centers, and Alpha Center, a South Dakota Registered Pregnancy Help Center
Matthew James Clark
    Counsel of Record
Alabama Center for Law and Liberty
2213 Morris Ave.
Floor 1
Birmingham, AL 35203

matt@alabamalawandliberty.org
256-510-1828
Party name: Alabama Center for Law and Liberty
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste. 430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3833
Party name: Pacific Justice Institute
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste. 430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3833
Party name: Joseph W. Dellapenna
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste. 430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3833
Party name: Billy Graham Evangelistic Association, et al.
Kimberlee Wood Colby
    Counsel of Record
Christian Legal Society
8001 Braddock Rd., Suite 302
Springfield, VA 22151

kcolby@clsnet.org
703-894-1087
Party name: Christian Legal Society and Robertson Center for Constitutional Law
Teresa Stanton Collett
    Counsel of Record
University of St. Thomas School of Law
MSL 400
1000 LaSalle Avenue
Minneapolis, MN 55403

tscollett@stthomas.edu
6512712958
Party name: Prolife Center at the University of St. Thomas
Teresa Stanton Collett
    Counsel of Record
2189 Sargent Avenue
Saint Paul, MN 55105

tscollett@stthomas.edu
6512712958
Party name: 240 Women Scholars and Professionals, and Prolife Feminist Organizations
Sean Richard Collier
    Counsel of Record
Collier Legal, LLC
12 Granary Road
Stockton, NJ 08559

sean.collier@gmail.com
9085817180
Party name: Good Counsel, Inc.
Charles Justin Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

ccooper@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Ethics and Public Policy Center
Meredith Leigh Di Liberto
    Counsel of Record
Judicial Watch, Inc.
425 Third Street SW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20024

mdiliberto@judicialwatch.org
2026465172
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc.
Mario Alberto Diaz
    Counsel of Record
Concerned Women for America
1000 N. Payne St.
Alexandria, VA 22314

mdiaz@cwfa.org
2024887000
Party name: Concerned Women for America
Farah Christina Diaz-Tello
    Counsel of Record
If/When/How: Lawyering for Reproductive Justice
1714 Franklin Street #100-393
Oakland, CA 94612

farah@ifwhenhow.org
347-974-7337
Party name: Experts, Researchers, and Advocates Opposing the Criminalization of People Who Have Abortions
Lynn Downey Dowd
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Lynn D. Dowd
29 W Benton Ave
Naperville, IL 60540

ldowd@msn.com
6306657851
Party name: Biologists
Lael Ruth Echo-Hawk
    Counsel of Record
MThirtysix PLLC
700 Pennsylvania Ave. SE
2nd FL – The Yard
Washington, DC 20003

lael@mthirtysixpllc.com
(206) 271-0106
Party name: Cecilia Fire Thunder; National Indigenous Women’s Resource Center; the Native American Community Board; and Additional Advocacy Organizations and Individuals
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36064

eidsmoeja@juno.com
3343241812
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law, Lutherans for Life
Jonathan English
    Counsel of Record
451 7th Street SW
Washington, DC 20410

jenglish2@gmail.com
202-469-0116
Party name: Jonathan English
Brian James Field
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr Jaffe
1717 K Street NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

bfield@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: European Legal Scholars
Clarke David Forsythe
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Life
1150 Connecticut Ave. NW
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20036

clarke.forsythe@aul.org
3122854568
Party name: Americans United for Life
Alexis Irene Fragosa
    Counsel of Record
Center for Family and Human Rights
776 Walker Road, Suite E
Great Falls, VA 22066

iyc@c-fam.org
6262410594
Party name: Center for Family and Human Rights
Scott William Gaylord
    Counsel of Record
Elon University School of Law
201 North Greene Street
Greensboro, NC 27401

sgaylord@elon.edu
3362799331
Party name: CatholicVote.org Education Fund
Robert P. George
    Counsel of Record
Robinson & McElwee, PLLC
700 Virginia Street East, Suite 400
Charleston, WV 25301

rgeorge@princeton.edu
6096584510
Party name: Scholars of Jurisprudence John M. Finnis and Robert P. George
Stephen Gilles
    Counsel of Record
Quinnipiac University School of Law
275 Mount Carmel Ave.
Hamden, CT 06518

stephen.gerard.gilles@gmail.com
8609928130
Party name: Professor Stephen G. Gilles
Samuel David Green
    Counsel of Record
Reason for Life
P.O. Box 500040
Palmdale, CA 93550

sgreen@reasonforlife.org
(661) 524-5770
Party name: Reason for Life
Matthew Edwin Gronda
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
P.O. Box 70
Saint Charles, MI 48655

matt@matthewgronda.com
989-249-0350
Party name: Rep. Steve Carra and 320 State Legislators from 35 States
Heather Gebelin Hacker
    Counsel of Record
Hacker Stephens LLP
108 Wild Basin Rd
Suite 250
Austin, TX 78746

heather@hackerstephens.com
512-399-3022
Party name: Professors Mary Ann Glendon and O. Carter Snead
Heather Gebelin Hacker
    Counsel of Record
Hacker Stephens LLP
108 Wild Basin Rd
Suite 250
Austin, TX 78746

heather@hackerstephens.com
512-399-3022
Party name: Monique Chireau Wubbenhorst, M.D., M.P.H., et al.
Erica Worth Harris
    Counsel of Record
Susman Godfrey, LLP
1000 Louisiana, Suite 5100
Houston, TX 77002-5096

eharris@susmangodfrey.com
7136537810
Party name: Advocates for Youth, Inc. and Neo Philanthropy, Inc. d/b/a We Testify
Joshua David Hawley
    Counsel of Record
N/A
115 Russell Senate Office Bldg.
Washington, DC 20510

ellen_james@hawley.senate.gov
202-224-6154
Party name: Senators Josh Hawley, Mike Lee, and Ted Cruz
James L. Hirsen
    Counsel of Record
505 S. Villa Real Drive, Suite 101
Anaheim Hills, CA 92807

james@jameshirsen.com
714-283-8880
Party name: World Faith Foundation and Institute for Faith and Family
Nathan W. Kellum
    Counsel of Record
Center for Religious Expression
699 Oakleaf Office Lane
Suite 107
Memphis, TN 38117

nkellum@crelaw.org
9016845485
Party name: Center for Religious Expression
Antony B. Kolenc
    Counsel of Record
106 S Harwood St
Dallas, TX 75201

antony.kolenc@untdallas.edu
2142431781
Party name: 141 International Legal Scholars
William Grayson Lambert
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Governor
South Carolina State House
1100 Gervais Street
Columbia, SC 29201

glambert@governor.sc.gov
8037342100
Party name: Governor Henry McMaster and Eleven Additional Governors
Stephen C. Leckar
    Counsel of Record
Kalbain Hagerty LLP
888 17th Street. NW
Twelfth Floor
Washington, DC 20006

sleckar@kalbianhagerty.com
(202) 223-5600
Party name: Anthony Hawks
Jonathan Philip Lienhard
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky & Josefiak PLLC
15405 John Marshall Highway
Haymarket, VA 20169

jlienhard@holtzmanvogel.com
15403418808
Party name: March for Life Education and Defense Fund
George Lester Lyon Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Lukas, Nace, Gutierrez & Sachs, Chartered
1929 Biltmore Street, NW
Washington, DC 20009

GLYON@FCCLAW.COM
202-669-0442
Party name: Mary Kay Bacallao Advocating for Unborn Children as Persons
Rebecca Susan Markert
    Counsel of Record
Freedom form Religion Foundation
P.O. Box 750
Madison, WI 53701

rmarkert@ffrf.org
(608) 256-8900
Party name: The Freedom From Religion Foundation, Center for Inquiry, and American Atheists
Thomas Ryan McCarthy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Family Research Council
Julian Lenwood McPhillips Jr.
    Counsel of Record
McPhillips Shinbaum, LLP
516 S Perry St
Montgomery, AL 36104

julianmcphillips@icloud.com
3342621911
Party name: Democrats for Life of America Five Democratic Legislators from Five Individual State Legislatures
Patrick Michael McSweeney
    Counsel of Record
McSweeney, Cynkar & Kachouroff, PLLC
3358 John Tree Hill Rd
Powhatan, VA 23139

patrick@mck-lawyers.com
7036213300
Party name: Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund
Christopher Ernest Mills
    Counsel of Record
Spero Law LLC
1050 Johnnie Dodds Blvd. #83
Mt. Pleasant, SC 29465

cmills@spero.law
8436060640
Party name: American College of Pediatricians and Association of American Physicians & Surgeons
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Law PLLC
111 Congress Avenue
Suite 400
Austin, TX 78701

jonathan@mitchell.law
(512) 686-3940
Party name: Texas Right to Life
Kerry Lee Morgan
    Counsel of Record
Kerry L. Morgan
2915 Biddle Avenue
Suite 200
Wyandotte, MI 48192

kmorgan@pck-law.com
(734) 281-7100
Party name: LONANG Institute
Robert Joseph Muise
    Counsel of Record
American Freedom Law Center
PO Box 131098
Ann Arbor, MI 48113

rmuise@americanfreedomlawcenter.org
7346353756
Party name: Priests for Life
Andrew C. Nichols
    Counsel of Record
Charis Lex P.C.
4250 N. Fairfax Dr.
Suite 600
Arlington, VA 22203

anichols@charislex.com
571-549-2645
Party name: American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians and Gynecologists
Thomas Gerald Olp
    Counsel of Record
Thomas More Society
309 W. Washington Street
Suite 1250
Chicago, IL 60606

tolp@thomasmoresociety.org
3127821680
Party name: Illinois Right to Life, et al.
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

wjo@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: Intercessors for America including its Intercessor Prayer Partners
Allan E. Parker Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Justice Foundation
8023 Vantage Dr.
Suite 1275
San Antonio, TX 78230

aparker@txjf.org
2106147157
Party name: Jewish Prolife Foundation, The Coalition for Jewish Values, Rabbi Yacov David Cohen, Rabbi Chananya Weissman, and Bonnie Chernin (President, Jewish Life League)
Allan E. Parker Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Justice Foundation
8023 Vantage Dr.
Suite 1275
San Antonio, TX 78230

aparker@txjf.org
2106147157
Party name: 375 Women Injured By Second And Third Trimester Late Term Abortions and Abortion Recovery Leaders
Allan E. Parker Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Justice Foundation
8023 Vantage Dr.
Suite 1275
San Antonio, TX 78230

aparker@txjf.org
2106147157
Party name: Melinda Thybault, Founder of The Moral Outcry Petition, et al.
Anthony Richard Picarello Jr.
    Counsel of Record
United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, Office of General Counsel
3211 4th Street, NE
Washignton, DC 20017

apicarello@usccb.org
202-541-3311
Party name: U.S. Conference of Catholic Bishops and Other Religious Organizations
Bradley Wayne Pierce
    Counsel of Record
Foundation to Abolish Abortion
P.O. Box 402
Liberty Hill, TX 78642

bpierce@abolishabortiontx.org
(512) 598-1092
Party name: Foundation to Abolish Abortion, et al
Maura Katherine Quinlan
    Counsel of Record
38 Golfview Road
Camp Hill, PA 17011

maurakquinlan@outlook.com
717-460-8565
Party name: Pennsylvania Pro-Life Federation
Mark Leonard Rienzi
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1919 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006

mrienzi@becketlaw.org
(202) 955-0095
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
D. Kent Safriet
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky & Josefiak PLLC
15405 John Marshall Highway
Haymarket, VA 20169

kent@holtzmanvogel.com
(540) 341-8808
Party name: Christian Medical & Dental Associations
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Maureen L. Condic, Ph.D. and the Charlotte Lozier Institute
Elizabeth Brooks Scherer
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 27525
Raleigh, NC 27611

scherer.appeals@gmail.com
919.755.8790
Party name: Professor Randy Beck
Linda Boston Schlueter
    Counsel of Record
Trinity Legal Center
1150 N. Loop 1604 W.
Suite 108-208
San Antonio, TX 78248

TLC4Linda@aol.com
210-274-5274
Party name: Trinity Legal Center
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
2025468890
Party name: Elliot Institute
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
20225468890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice and Bioethics Defense Fund
Jordan Adam Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, NE
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow.jas@aclj.org
202-546-8890
Party name: The European Centre for Law and Justice
Jeffrey A. Shafer
    Counsel of Record
Langdon Law LLC
8913 Cincinnati-Dayton Rd.
West Chester, OH 45069

jshafer@langdonlaw.com
513-577-7380
Party name: 396 State Legislators from 41 States
Howard Nathan Slugh
    Counsel of Record
2400 Virginia Ave NW
Apt C619
Washington, DC 20037

hslugh@jcrl.org
954-328-9461
Party name: Jewish Coalition For Religious Liberty
J. Thomas Smith Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Government Defense Fund
1113 Murfreesboro Road
106-167
Franklin, TN 37064

jthomsmith@cgdfund.com
202-669-1452
Party name: 22 State Policy Organizations
William Lucien Smith
    Counsel of Record
Balch & Bingham LLP
188 East Capitol Street, Suite 1400
Jackson, MS 39201

bsmith@balch.com
6019658175
Party name: Commissioner Andy Gipson, et al.
Mathew D. Staver
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Counsel
PO Box 540774
Orlando, FL 32854

court@lc.org
407-875-1776
Party name: African American, Hispanic, Roman Catholic and Protestant Religious and Civil Rights Organizations and Leaders
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: States of Texas, et al.
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: States of Texas, et al.,
William Wagner
    Counsel of Record
Great Lakes Justice Center
5600 W. Mount Hope Hwy.
Upper Level
Lansing, MI 48917

Prof.WWJD@gmail.com
517-643-1765
Party name: National Catholic Bioethics Center, et al.
Kevin Christian Walsh
    Counsel of Record
University of Richmond School of Law
203 Richmond Way
Richmond, VA 23173

kwalsh@richmond.edu
804-287-6018
Party name: Professor Kurt T. Lash
Edward Mark Wenger
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky & Josefiak PLLC
2300 N Street NW
Suite 643-A
Washington, DC 20037

emwenger@holtzmanvogel.com
2027378808
Party name: The American Cornerstone Institute and its founder Dr. Benjamin S. Carson
Danielle Merry White
    Counsel of Record
Heartbeat International, Inc.
5000 Arlington Centre Blvd., Suite 2277
Columbus, OH 43220

dwhite@heartbeatinternational.org
6148857577
Party name: Heartbeat International, Inc.
Philip Daniel Williamson
    Counsel of Record
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
425 Walnut Street, Suite 1800
Cincinnati, OH 45202

pwilliamson@taftlaw.com
5133579417
Party name: Lee J. Strang
Chelsey Danaye Youman
    Counsel of Record
Human Coalition Action
P.O. Box 5052
Frisco, TX 75035

cyouman@hucoaction.org
2146294806
Party name: Human Coalition Action and Students for Life of America
David Christopher Boyle
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 15143
Long Beach, CA 90815

dbo@boyleslaw.org
(734)-904-6132
Party name: David Boyle
David F. Forte
    Counsel of Record
Cleveland-Marshall College of Law, Cleveland State University
1801 Euclid Avenue
Cleveland, OH 44115

d.forte@csuohio.edu
216 403-3298
Party name: Cleveland Lawyers for Life
Paul Benjamin Linton
    Counsel of Record
921 Keystone Avenue
Northbrook, IL 60062

pblconlaw@aol.com
8472913848
Party name: Thomas More Society
Allan E. Parker Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Justice Foundation
8023 Vantage Drive
Suite 1275
San Antonio, TX 78230

aparker@txjf.org
2106147157
Party name: 375 Women Injured By Second and Third Trimester Late Term Abortions and Melinda Thybault, Individually and Acting on Behalf of 336,214 Signers of The Moral Outcry Petition
Maura Katherine Quinlan
    Counsel of Record
38 Golfview Road
Camp Hill, PA 17011

maurakquinlan@outlook.com
717-460-8565
Party name: Catholic Medical Association, National Association of Catholic Nurses-USA, Idaho Chooses Life and Texas Alliance for Life
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

jsekulow@claglaw.com
2022485407
Party name: American Center for Law & Justice
Catherine Wynne Short
    Counsel of Record
Life Legal Defense Foundation
P.O. Box 2105
Napa, CA 94558

kshort@lldf.org
(707) 224-6675
Party name: Robin Pierucci, M.D., and Life Legal Defense Foundation
Christian Janet Strickland
    Counsel of Record
Schwartz, Orgler & Jordan, PLLC
2355 Pass Road
Biloxi, MS 39531

christian@sojlaw.net
228-388-7441
Party name: Roman Catholic Diocese of Jackson and Roman Catholic Diocese of Biloxi

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543