Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1389
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1389
Title:Texas Democratic Party, et al., Petitioners
v.
Greg Abbott, Governor of Texas, et al.
Docketed:June 18, 2020
Linked with 19A1055
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-50407)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 16 2020Application (19A1055) to vacate stay, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 16 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due July 20, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2020Response to application (19A1055) requested by Justice Alito, due Monday, June 22, by 4 p.m. ET.
Jun 22 2020Response to application from respondents Greg Abbott, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 22 2020Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed by petitioners Texas Democratic Party, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 23 2020Reply of applicants Texas Democratic Party, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Jun 26 2020Application (19A1055) referred to the Court.
Jun 26 2020Application (19A1055) denied by the Court. Statement of JUSTICE SOTOMAYOR respecting the denial of application to vacate stay. (Detached Opinion).
Jul 02 2020Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment DENIED.
Jul 17 2020Waiver of right of respondent Greg Abbott, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Chris Hollins, Harris County Clerk, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Veterans Adm. Charles Abbot, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Sep 18 2020Letter of September 18, 2020 from counsel for petitioners Texas Democratic Party, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 22 2020Response Requested. (Due October 22, 2020)
Sep 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 22, 2020 to November 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 23, 2020.
Oct 22 2020Brief amici curiae of The Andrew Goodman Foundation, Equal Citizens, and Common Cause filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2020Brief of respondents Greg Abbott, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 07 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from December 9, 2020 to December 18, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 08 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition granted. The petition will be distributed December 23, 2020.
Dec 18 2020Reply of petitioners Texas Democratic Party, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 11 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Chad Wilson Dunn
    Counsel of Record
Brazil & Dunn
4407 Bee Caves Road
Building 1, Suite 111
Austin, TX 78746

chad@brazilanddunn.com
512-717-9822
Party name: Texas Democratic Party, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: Greg Abbott, et al.
Other
Jason Seth Harrow
    Counsel of Record
Equal Citizens
3243 S. La Cienega Blvd., Suite B
Los Angeles, CA 90016

jason.harrow@gmail.com
6103579614
Party name: The Andrew Goodman Foundation, Equal Citizens, and Common Cause
Juan Antonio Gonzalez
    Counsel of Record
Cameron County Commissioners Court- Civil Legal Divisiion
1100 East Monroe Street
Suite 233
Brownsville, TX 78521

juan.gonzalez@co.cameron.tx.us
9565501345
Party name: Cameron County, Texas and Remi Garza, Elections Administrator
Susan Hays
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Susan Hays, P.C.
P.O. Box 41647
Austin, TX 78704

hayslaw@me.com
214-557-4819
Party name: Chris Hollins, Harris County Clerk, et al.
Daniel Nemecio LopezCameron County Commissioners Court - Civil Legal Division
1100 E. Monroe St., Ste. 233
Brownsville, TX 78520

daniel.n.lopez@co.cameron.tx.us
(956) 550-1345
Party name: Cameron County, Texas and Remi Garza, Elections Administrator
Justin Carl Pfeiffer
    Counsel of Record
Fort Bend County Attorney's Office
401 Jackson Street, Third Floor
Richmond, TX 77469

Justin.Pfeiffer@fortbendcountytx.gov
832-312-7900
Party name: Fort Bend County, Texas
Pieter M. Schenkkan
    Counsel of Record
Graves Dougherty Hearon & Moody, P.C.
401 Congress Avenue
Suite 2700
Austin, TX 78701

pschenkkan@gdhm.com
512-480-5673
Party name: Veterans Adm. Charles Abbot, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543