SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-1370
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-1370
Title:
Kimberley Thames, Petitioner
v.
City of Westland, Michigan, et al.
Docketed:
June 12, 2020
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(18-1576, 18-1608, 18-1695)
Decision Date:
December 6, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
January 10, 2020
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jun 08 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 13, 2020)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jul 06 2020
Brief of respondents City of Westland, et al. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jul 21 2020
Reply of Kimberley Thames not accepted for filing. (July 24, 2020) (Corrected version submitted).
Jul 21 2020
Reply of petitioner Kimberley Thames filed. (Distributed) (7/21/2020)
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jul 22 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 05 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert Joseph Muise
Counsel of Record
American Freedom Law Center
PO Box 131098
Ann Arbor, MI 48113
rmuise@americanfreedomlawcenter.org
7346353756
Party name: Kimberley Thames
Attorneys for Respondents
Douglas James Curlew
Counsel of Record
Cummings, McClorey, Davis & Acho, P.L.C.
17436 College Parkway
Livonia, MI 48152
dcurlew@cmda-law.com
734 261-2400
Party name: City of Westland, et al.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##