Docket for 19-1361 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jun 08 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 13, 2020) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jun 25 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 13, 2020 to August 12, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jun 26 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 12, 2020. | | | Aug 11 2020 | Brief of respondent Georgia Department of Corrections in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Aug 17 2020 | Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from August 26, 2020 to September 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Aug 18 2020 | Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until September 9, 2020 granted. | | | Sep 09 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020. | | | Sep 09 2020 | Reply of petitioners Richard Jordan, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Oct 05 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|