SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-1359
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-1359
Title:
Michelle Dawn Murphy, Petitioner
v.
City of Tulsa, Oklahoma
Docketed:
June 11, 2020
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(18-5097)
Decision Date:
December 16, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
January 8, 2020
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jun 03 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 13, 2020)
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Jul 13 2020
Brief of respondent City of Tulsa in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Jul 24 2020
Reply of petitioner Michelle Dawn Murphy filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jul 29 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 05 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jason Lee Glass
Counsel of Record
Baum Glass Jayne Carwile & Peters
401 S. Boston Ave.
Suite 2000
Tulsa, OK 74103
jglass@bgjclaw.com
9189387944
Party name: Michelle Dawn Murphy
Attorneys for Respondent
Gerald Matthew Bender
Counsel of Record
City of Tulsa Legal Department
175 E. 2nd Street
Suite 685
Tulsa, OK 74103
gbender@cityoftulsa.org
918-596-7717
Party name: City of Tulsa
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##