SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-1357
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-1357
Title:
Robert Angel Perez, Petitioner
v.
Colorado
Docketed:
June 11, 2020
Lower Ct:
Court of Appeals of Colorado
Case Numbers:
(16CA1180)
Decision Date:
June 13, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
February 24, 2020
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jun 04 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 13, 2020)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jun 29 2020
Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Robert A. Perez
Blanket Consent
Jul 01 2020
Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 13, 2020 to September 11, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jul 02 2020
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 11, 2020.
Jul 13 2020
Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jul 13 2020
Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Sep 11 2020
Brief of respondent Colorado in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Sep 25 2020
Reply of petitioner Robert A. Perez filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Sep 30 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/16/2020.
Oct 19 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kendall Kelly Alexis Turner
Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers
1625 I St. NW
Washington, DC 20006
kendallturner@omm.com
7036061934
Party name: Robert A. Perez
Attorneys for Respondent
L. Andrew Cooper
Counsel of Record
Office of the Colorado Attorney General
1300 Broadway St.
Denver, CO 80203
andrew.cooper@coag.gov
720-508-6465
Party name: Colorado
Other
Benjamin Paul Chagnon
Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005
bchagnon@orrick.com
202-339-8669
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Brianne Jenna Gorod
Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036
brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##