SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-1324
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-1324
Title:
Center for Immigration Studies, Petitioner
v.
Richard Cohen, et al.
Docketed:
June 1, 2020
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
Case Numbers:
(19-7122)
Decision Date:
April 24, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
May 20 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 1, 2020)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jun 30 2020
Brief of respondents Richard Cohen, et al. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jul 10 2020
Reply of petitioner Center for Immigration Studies filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jul 15 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 05 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Howard William Foster
Counsel of Record
Foster PC
150 N. Wacker Drive
Suite 2150
Chicago, IL 60606
hfoster@fosterpc.com
3127261600
Party name: Center for Immigration Studies
Attorneys for Respondents
Chad Russell Bowman
Counsel of Record
Ballard Spahr LLP
1909 K Street, NW
Twelfth Floor
Washington, DC 20006-1157
bowmanchad@ballardspahr.com
(202) 508-1120
Party name: Richard Cohen, et al.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##