Docket for 19-1307 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Mar 05 2020 | Application (19A996) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 17, 2020 to May 16, 2020, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 10 2020 | Application (19A996) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until May 16, 2020. | | | May 15 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 19, 2020) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 21 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 19, 2020 to July 19, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 22 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 20, 2020. See Rule 30.1. | | | Jul 20 2020 | Brief of respondent William Leroy Barnes in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jul 20 2020 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent William Leroy Barnes. | | Main Document | Aug 05 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020. | | | Oct 05 2020 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. | | | Oct 05 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|