Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1257
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1257
Vide 19-1258
Title:Mark Brnovich, Attorney General of Arizona, et al., Petitioners
v.
Democratic National Committee, et al.
Docketed:April 30, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-15845)
   Decision Date:January 27, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 27 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 1, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Mark Brnovich, et al.
Blanket Consent
May 20 2020Motion of respondent Katie Hobbs, Arizona Secretary of State to extend the time to file a response from June 1, 2020 to July 1, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 1, 2020, for all respondents.
May 29 2020Brief amici curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 29 2020Brief amici curiae of States of Ohio, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of Republican State Leadership Committee filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2020Brief amici curiae of Election Integrity Project California and Arizona filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of Helen Purcell filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2020Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, Center for Equal Opportunity, and Project 21 filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Constitutional Union filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2020Brief amici curiae of Kentucky Secretary of State Michael Adams, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2020Brief amici curiae of Elijah Haahr, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of Honest Elections Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of Maricopa County filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2020Brief amici curiae of Public Interest Legal Foundation et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2020Brief amici curiae of Governor Douglas A. Ducey, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2020Brief amici curiae of United States Senators Ted Cruz, Marsha Blackburn, John Cornyn, Tom Cotton, James M. Inhofe, James Lankford, And Mike Lee filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 01 2020Brief of respondent Katie Hobbs, Arizona Secretary of State in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 01 2020Brief of respondents Democratic National Committee, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 02 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from July 15, 2020 to July 29, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 02 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until July 29, 2020, granted.
Jul 28 2020Reply of petitioner Mark Brnovich, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 02 2020Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-1258 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Oct 02 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-1257. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-1257. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Oct 26 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Mark Brnovich, et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 28 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Arizona Republican Party, et al.
Blanket Consent
Nov 11 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Katie Hobbs, Arizona Secretary of State. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Nov 13 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Democratic National Committee, et al. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Nov 13 2020Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed. VIDED.
Main Document
Nov 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' briefs on the merits is extended to and including November 30, 2020. The time to file respondents' briefs on the merits is extended to and including January 13, 2021. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael A. Carvin
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

macarvin@jonesday.com
(202) 879-7643
Party name: Arizona Republican Party, et al.
Joseph Andrew Kanefield
    Counsel of Record
Arizona Attorney General's Office
2005 N. Central Ave
Phoenix, AZ 85004

allyson.flanagan@azag.gov
6025428017
Party name: Mark Brnovich, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

JAmunson@jenner.com
202-639-6023
Party name: Katie Hobbs, Arizona Secretary of State
Marc Erik Elias
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Cole, LLP
700 13th St, NW
Ste. 800
Washington, DC 20005-3960

melias@perkinscoie.com
202-434-1609
Party name: Democratic National Committee, et al.
Other
John Christian Adams
    Counsel of Record
Public Interest Legal Foundation
32 E. Washington St.
Suite 1675
Indianapolis, IN 46204

adams@electionlawcenter.com
317-203-5599
Party name: Public Interest Legal Foundation et al.
Bobby Burchfield
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

bburchfield@kslaw.com
202-626-5524
Party name: Elijah Haahr, Paul Gazelka, David Ralston, Ron Ryckman, Brady Brammer, and Matt Simpson
H. Christopher Coates
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of H. Christopher Coates
934 Compass Point
Charleston, SC 29412

curriecoates@gmail.com
(843) 609-7080
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation
Dominic Emil Draye
    Counsel of Record
Greenberg Traurig LLP
2101 L Street N.W.
Washington, DC, DC 20037

drayed@gtlaw.com
(202) 331-3168
Party name: Governor Douglas A. Ducey, President of the Arizona State Senate Karen Fann, and Speaker of the Arizona House of Representatives Russell Bowers
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: States of Ohio, Alabama, Alaska, Arkansas, Georgia, Idaho, Indiana, Kentucky, Louisiana, Mississippi, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, and West Virginia
Jeffrey Matthew Harris
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

jeff@consovoymccarthy.com
202-321-4120
Party name: Honest Elections Project
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts LLP
700 K St NW
Washington, DC 20001

scott.keller@bakerbotts.com
2026397837
Party name: United States Senators Ted Cruz, Marsha Blackburn, John Cornyn, Tom Cotton, James M. Inhofe, James Lankford, And Mike Lee
Christopher Matthew Kieser
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

ckieser@pacificlegal.org
9165039059
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation, Center for Equal Opportunity, and Project 21
Thomas Purcell Liddy
    Counsel of Record
Maricopa County Attorney's Office
222 North Central Avenue
Suite 1100
Phoenix, AZ 85004

liddyt@mcao.maricopa.gov
602.506.8541
Party name: Maricopa County
Brett Robert Nolan
    Counsel of Record
Kentucky Office of the Attorney General
700 Capital Avenue, Suite 118
Frankfort, KY 40601

brett.nolan@ky.gov
502-696-5300
Party name: Kentucky Secretary of State Michael Adams, Louisiana Secretary of State R. Kyle Ardoin, and Missouri Secretary of State John R. Ashcroft
Michael James O'Neill
    Counsel of Record
Landmark Legal Foundation
19415 Deerfield Ave. Suite 312
Leesburg, VA 20176

mike@landmarklegal.org
703-554-6105
Party name: Election Integrity Project California and Arizona
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jack Park
616-B Green Street
Suite 2200
Gainesville, GA 30501

jjp@jackparklaw.com
470-892-6444
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jack Park
616-B Green Street
Gainesville, GA 30501

jjp@jackparklaw.com
470-892-6444
Party name: American Constitutional Union
Charles Robert Spies
    Counsel of Record
Dickinson Wright PLLC
1825 Eye Street NW
STE 900
Washington, DC 20006

cspies@dickinsonwright.com
202-466-5964
Party name: Republican State Leadership Committee
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC
45 North Hill Dr., Suite 100
Warrenton, VA 20186

Jtorchinsky@hvjt.law
540 341 8808
Party name: Helen Purcell

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543