Feb 05 2020 | Application (19A884) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 8, 2020 to April 8, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. |
| Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service |
Feb 14 2020 | Application (19A884) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until April 8, 2020. |
| |
Mar 26 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 18, 2020) |
| PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Apr 30 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent Colorado to respond filed. |
| Main Document |
May 12 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/28/2020. |
| |
May 26 2020 | Response Requested. (Due June 25, 2020) |
| |
Jun 19 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 25, 2020 to July 27, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Jun 22 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 27, 2020. |
| |
Jul 24 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 27, 2020 to August 24, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Jul 27 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 24, 2020. |
| |
Aug 24 2020 | Brief of respondent Colorado in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Aug 27 2020 | Proposal under Rule 32.3 to lodge non-record material with the Clerk filed by counsel for respondent. |
| Main Document |
Sep 02 2020 | Reply of petitioner Marcus Lee Robinson filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
Sep 09 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020. |
| |
Oct 05 2020 | Petition DENIED. |
| |