Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1106 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1106 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Tommy Sharp, Interim Warden, Petitioner
v.
Roderick L. Smith
Docketed:March 10, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-6184)
   Decision Date:August 26, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 2, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 02 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 9, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 9, 2020 to May 25, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 26, 2020. See Rule 30.1.
May 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 26, 2020 to June 25, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 06 2020Response to motion from petitioner Tommy Sharp, Interim Warden filed.
Main Document
May 07 2020Motion to further extend the time to file a response is denied.
May 26 2020Brief of respondent Roderick Smith in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 26 2020Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Roderick Smith.
Main Document
Jun 03 2020Reply of petitioner Tommy Sharp, Interim Warden filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020.
Jun 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2020.
Jul 02 2020Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Jul 02 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Caroline Elizabeth Jane Hunt
    Counsel of Record
Oklahoma Attorney General's Office
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

caroline.hunt@oag.ok.gov
405-521-3921
Party name: Tommy Sharp, Interim Warden
Attorneys for Respondent
Emma Victoria Rolls
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
215 Dean A. McGee, Suite 707
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

emma_rolls@fd.org
405-609-5975
Party name: Roderick Smith

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543