SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-1105 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-1105 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Tommy Sharp, Interim Warden, Petitioner
v.
Jimmy Dean Harris
Docketed:
March 10, 2020
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(17-6109)
Decision Date:
October 28, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
December 24, 2019
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Mar 02 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 9, 2020)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 18 2020
Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 9, 2020 to May 11, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Mar 19 2020
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 11, 2020.
May 11 2020
Brief of respondent Jimmy Dean Harris in opposition filed.
Main Document
Other
Proof of Service
May 11 2020
Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Jimmy Dean Harris.
Main Document
May 22 2020
Reply of petitioner Tommy Sharp, Interim Warden filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
May 26 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/11/2020.
Jun 15 2020
Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Jun 15 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jennifer L. Crabb
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
313 N.E. 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105
fhc.docket@oag.ok.gov
405-521-3921
Party name: Tommy Sharp, Interim Warden
Attorneys for Respondent
Emma Victoria Rolls
Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
215 Dean A. McGee, Suite 707
Oklahoma City, OK 73102
emma_rolls@fd.org
405-609-5975
Party name: Jimmy Dean Harris
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##