Docket for 19-1067
|
Dec 13 2019 | Application (19A677) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 31, 2019 to January 29, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions | Dec 17 2019 | Application (19A677) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until January 29, 2020. | | | Jan 16 2020 | Application (19A677) to extend further the time from January 29, 2020 to February 28, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Written Request | Jan 21 2020 | Application (19A677) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 28, 2020. | | | Feb 25 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 30, 2020) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 26 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent S.R. Nehad, et al. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Mar 27 2020 | Brief amici curiae of California State Association of Counties and the League of California Cities filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 01 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2020. | | | Apr 08 2020 | Response Requested. (Due May 8, 2020) | | | Apr 14 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 8, 2020 to July 7, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 15 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 7, 2020. | | | Jul 07 2020 | Brief of respondents S.R. Nehad, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word Count | Jul 20 2020 | Reply of petitioners Neal Browder, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jul 22 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020. | | | Oct 05 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|