Docket for 19-1031
|
Feb 14 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 20, 2020) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 28 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent Office of the Attorney General of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts, et al. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Mar 04 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/20/2020. | | | Mar 17 2020 | Response Requested. (Due April 16, 2020) | | | Mar 17 2020 | Brief amicus curiae of The Alliance for International Exchange filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Mar 19 2020 | Letter of March 17, 2020 from counsel for petitioners received. | | Main Document | Mar 20 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 16, 2020 to May 18, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 20 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 18, 2020. | | | Apr 16 2020 | Brief amici curiae of Current and Former Au Pairs filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 16 2020 | Brief amici curiae of Host Families filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 18 2020 | Brief of respondents Office of the Attorney General of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jun 02 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/18/2020. | | | Jun 02 2020 | Reply of petitioners Erin Capron, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jun 22 2020 | Petition DENIED. Justice Breyer took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. | | |
|