Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1001
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1001
Title:Noble Cooper, et al., Petitioners
v.
Officer Oliver Flaig, et al.
Docketed:February 10, 2020
Linked with 19A725
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-50499)
   Decision Date:October 8, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 26 2019Application (19A725) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 6, 2020 to February 21, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 30 2019Application (19A725) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 5, 2020.
Feb 05 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 11, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2020Waiver of right of respondents Oliver Flaig, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 25 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2020.
Apr 07 2020Rescheduled.
Apr 28 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
May 12 2020Rescheduled.
May 18 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/21/2020.
May 21 2020Rescheduled.
May 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/28/2020.
May 26 2020Rescheduled.
Jun 01 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020.
Jun 02 2020Rescheduled.
Jun 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/11/2020.
Jun 09 2020Rescheduled.
Jun 15 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/18/2020.
Jun 22 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Edward L. Pina
    Counsel of Record
Edward L. Pina & Associates, P.C.
8118 Datapoint Drive
San Antonio, TX 78229

epina@arielhouse.com
(210) 614-6400
Party name: Noble Cooper, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Nathan Mark Ralls
    Counsel of Record
Hoblit Darling Ralls Hernandez & Hudlow, LLP
4263 IH-10 West
Suite 601
San Antonio, TX 78201

mralls@hdr-law.com
210-224-9991
Party name: Oliver Flaig, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543