Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A375
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A375
Title:In Re Department of Commerce, et al., Applicants
Docketed:October 9, 2018
Linked with 18-557
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2652 18-2659 18-2856 18-2857)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 09 2018UPON CONSIDERATION of the application of counsel for the applicants, IT IS ORDERED that the orders of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, dated July 3, 2018, August 17, 2018, and September 21, 2018, are stayed pending receipt of a response, due on or before October 11, 2018, by 4 p.m., and further order of Justice Ginsburg or of the Court.
Oct 09 2018Application (18A375) for a stay, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main DocumentMain Document
Oct 10 2018Letter of applicants received.
Oct 11 2018Response to application from respondent New York, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 11 2018Response to application from respondent New York Immigration Coalition, et al. filed.
Main DocumentMain Document
Oct 12 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund.
Main Document
Oct 12 2018Reply of applicants United States Department of Commerce, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceReply
Oct 17 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by California.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 22 2018Application (18A375) referred to the Court.
Oct 22 2018The application for stay (18A375) presented to JUSTICE GINSBURG and by her referred to the Court is granted in part and denied in part. The application is granted as to the order of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York dated September 21, 2018, which is stayed through October 29, 2018 at 4 p.m. The application is denied as to the orders of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York dated July 3,2018 and August 17, 2018. If the applicants file a petition for a writ of certiorari or a petition for a writ of mandamus with respect to the stayed order by or before October 29, 2018 at 4 p.m., the stay will remain in effect until disposition of such petition by this Court. Should the petition be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. The denial of the stay with respect to the remaining orders does not preclude the applicants from making arguments with respect to those orders. Justice Gorsuch, with whom Justice Thomas joins, concurs in part and dissents in part. (Detached opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: In Re United States Department of Commerce, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Attorney General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: State of New York and Other Government Plaintiffs
Other
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund
Michael James Mongan
    Counsel of Record
State of CA, Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

michael.mongan@doj.ca.gov
(415) 510-3920
Party name: State of California

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543