Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A178
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A178
Title:Ivan Pena, et al., Applicants
v.
Stephen Lindley
Docketed:August 17, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-15449)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 16 2018Application (18A178) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 1, 2018 to December 31, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 20 2018Application (18A178) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 31, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Alan Gura
    Counsel of Record
Gura PLLC
916 Prince Street
Suite 107
Alexandria, VA 22314

alan@gurapllc.com
7038359085
Party name: Ivan Pena, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543