Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A1242
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A1242
Title:Larry Householder, et al., Applicants
v.
Ohio A. Philip Randolph Institute, et al.
Docketed:May 30, 2019
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
   Case Numbers:(1:18-cv-357)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 28 2019Application (18A1242) to extend the time to file a jurisdictional statement on appeal from July 5, 2019 to July 19, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 29 2019Response to application from respondents Ohio A. Philip Randolph Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentMain Document
Jun 05 2019Application (18A1242) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until July 19, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: Larry Householder, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Tiffany Alora Thomas
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Inc.
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

athomas@aclu.org
212-519-7866
Party name: Ohio A. Philip Randolph Institute, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543