Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A1205
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A1205
Title:James W. Richards, IV, Applicant
v.
Deborah Lee James, Secretary of the Air Force, et al.
Docketed:May 21, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(19-0093/AF)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 20 2019Application (18A1205) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 30, 2019 to July 9, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 22 2019Application (18A1205) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 9, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark Clifford Bruegger
    Counsel of Record
U.S. Air Force
1500 West Perimeter Road
Suite 1100
Joint Base Andrews Naval Air Facility, MD 20762

mark.c.bruegger.civ@mail.mil
2406124782
Party name: James Richards
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: James, Deborah Lee, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543