Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A1168
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A1168
Title:United States, Applicant
v.
Michael J.D. Briggs
Docketed:May 13, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(16-0711)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 10 2019Application (18A1168) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 23, 2019 to June 22, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 14 2019Application (18A1168) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 22, 2019.
Jun 11 2019Application (18A1168) to extend further the time from June 22, 2019 to July 22, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Written RequestProof of Service
Jun 12 2019Application (18A1168) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 22, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543