Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-987
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-987
Title:McKesson Corporation, et al., Petitioners
v.
True Health Chiropractic, Inc., et al.
Docketed:January 29, 2019
Linked with 18A525
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-17123)
   Decision Date:July 17, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:August 30, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 16 2018Application (18A525) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 28, 2018 to January 25, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Nov 16 2018Application (18A525) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until January 25, 2019.
Jan 25 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 28, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2019Amicus brief of DRI—The Voice of the Defense Bar not accepted for filing. (February 28, 2019) (Corrected electronic version submitted)
Feb 28 2019Waiver of right of respondents True Health Chiropractic, Inc., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 28 2019Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Feb 28 2019Brief amicus curiae of DRI—The Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 06 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/22/2019.
Mar 06 2019Certificate of service filed with respect to brief of amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
Proof of Service
Mar 13 2019Response Requested. (Due April 12, 2019)
Mar 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 12, 2019 to June 11, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 18 2019Response to motion from petitioner McKesson Corporation, et al. filed.
Main Document
Mar 21 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including May 21, 2019.
May 21 2019Brief of respondents True Health Chiropractic, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2019Reply of petitioners McKesson Corporation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 24 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Joseph Russell Palmore
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster LLP
2000 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20006

jpalmore@mofo.com
202-887-6940
Party name: McKesson Corporation, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Glenn L. Hara
    Counsel of Record
Anderson + Wanca
3701 Algonquin Road, Suite 500
Rolling Meadows, IL 60008

ghara@andersonwanca.com
(847) 368-1500
Party name: True Health Chiropractic, Inc., et al.
Other
Ashley C. Parrish
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

aparrish@kslaw.com
202-626-2627
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, and The Business Roundtable
Scott Burnett Smith
    Counsel of Record
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP
200 Clinton Avenue West, Suite 900
Huntsville, AL 35801

ssmith@bradley.com
256-517-5100
Party name: DRI—The Voice of the Defense Bar

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543