Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-9064
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-9064
Title:Adonijah Lindsay, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 1, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3433)
   Decision Date:February 22, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 26 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 31, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
May 07 2019Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
May 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019.
May 21 2019Response Requested. (Due June 20, 2019)
Jun 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 20, 2019 to July 22, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 13 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 22, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adonijah Lindsay#28375-505
FCC Low
P.O. Box 1031
Coleman, FL 33521

Party name: Adonijah Lindsay
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543