Docket for 18-8977
|
Feb 28 2019 | Application (18A886) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 20, 2019 to April 19, 2019, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Feb 28 2019 | Application (18A886) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until April 19, 2019. | | | Apr 19 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 24, 2019) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | May 14 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 24, 2019 to June 24, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 16 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 24, 2019. | | | Jun 24 2019 | Brief of respondent Brian Foster, Warden in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jul 10 2019 | Reply of petitioner Scott Schmidt filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jul 11 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. | | | Oct 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|